NJ A4515 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG to establish law enforcement officer use of force data collection and reporting system.
Title
Requires AG to establish law enforcement officer use of force data collection and reporting system.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-2-6) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4515 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2808 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2808 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee