NJ A4535 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2958 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2958 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Energy Infrastructure Public-Private Partnership Act."
Title
Establishes the "Energy Infrastructure Public-Private Partnership Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2958 (2R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2958 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session