NJ A4547 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes temporary rate adjustment for certain nursing facilities; appropriates $62.3 million.
Title
Authorizes temporary rate adjustment for certain nursing facilities; appropriates $62.3 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2813 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.90. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2813 (1R) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-8-3) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2813 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4547 (1R)