NJ A4550 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1099
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Military Advisory Board."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Military Advisory Board."
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4550 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3135 (Same As) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3135 (Same As) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee