NJ A4552 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.234.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.234.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits leasing dogs and cats.
Title
Prohibits leasing dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3531 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3531 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.234. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-1-0) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S3531 (SCS/1R) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Gopal) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-1) |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3531 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A4552 (ACS/1R)