NJ A4553 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A739
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Affords civil immunity to certain police officers.
Title
Affords civil immunity to certain police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4553 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee