NJ A4580 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S671
Note: Carry Over of previous A2354
Note: Carry Over of previous A2354
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S73 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S73 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for sale of cottage food products.
Title
Establishes requirements for sale of cottage food products.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Edward Thomson [R] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S73 (3R) |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S73 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S671 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2354 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S671 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2354 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee