NJ A4588 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases strangulation assault to crime of second degree.
Title
Increases strangulation assault to crime of second degree.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2503 |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2503 (Same As) 2021-07-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.172.