NJ A4594 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2826 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2826 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOE to establish five-year pilot program for issuance of limited certificate of eligibility with advanced standing and limited certificate of eligibility for certain teacher candidates.
Title
Directs DOE to establish five-year pilot program for issuance of limited certificate of eligibility with advanced standing and limited certificate of eligibility for certain teacher candidates.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S2826 (1R) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2826 (Same As) 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.224.