NJ A4597 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.168.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.168.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriation of $11,300,000 from General Fund to DOE to increase per pupil funding for nonpublic security aid from $75 to $150.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriation of $11,300,000 from General Fund to DOE to increase per pupil funding for nonpublic security aid from $75 to $150.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3080 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.168. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S3080 |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3080 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4597