NJ A4598 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2767 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2767 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes database to aid in civil service hiring process for law enforcement officers; requires Statewide diversity analysis of law enforcement.
Title
Establishes database to aid in civil service hiring process for law enforcement officers; requires Statewide diversity analysis of law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2767 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2767 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.236.