NJ A4624 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2817
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2817
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows active duty service members to provide document other than DD-214 when claiming veterans' preference for civil service.
Title
Allows active duty service members to provide document other than DD-214 when claiming veterans' preference for civil service.
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2817 |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2817 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.340.