NJ A4632 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1879
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to provide written knowledge examination online during COVID-19 public health emergency and state of emergency.
Title
Requires MVC to provide written knowledge examination online during COVID-19 public health emergency and state of emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4632 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3177 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3177 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee