NJ A4654 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5865
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits State agency to completely or partially terminate contract concerning marine terminal or attendant real property to serve important public purpose.
Title
Permits State agency to completely or partially terminate contract concerning marine terminal or attendant real property to serve important public purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2913 |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2913 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A5865 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5865 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading