NJ A4681 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1968
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns residential community release programs.
Title
Concerns residential community release programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-11-1) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4681 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2933 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2933 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee