NJ A4698 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes owning or possessing animal fighting or dog fighting paraphernalia as crime of third degree; establishes civil animal cruelty penalties therefor.
Title
Establishes owning or possessing animal fighting or dog fighting paraphernalia as crime of third degree; establishes civil animal cruelty penalties therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3146 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3146 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.223.