NJ A4710 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.338.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.338.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Strengthening Gifted and Talented Education Act"; establishes school district responsibilities in educating gifted and talented students.
Title
"Strengthening Gifted and Talented Education Act"; establishes school district responsibilities in educating gifted and talented students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3258 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3258 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.338. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Substituted for S3258 (1R) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Beach) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3258 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - Substituted by A4710 (1R)