NJ A4741 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities to establish temporary supplemental zoning boards of adjustment to address application backlogs.
Title
Permits municipalities to establish temporary supplemental zoning boards of adjustment to address application backlogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3212 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3212 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.225.