NJ A4744 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to ensure medication assisted treatment benefits under Medicaid program are provided without the imposition of prior authorization requirements.
Title
Requires DHS to ensure medication assisted treatment benefits under Medicaid program are provided without the imposition of prior authorization requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3314 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.163. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3314 (3R) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (50-26-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bramnick) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3314 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A4744 (1R)