NJ A4752 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S3247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes State Treasurer to convey surplus real property known as Learning Center in City of Vineland, County of Cumberland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes State Treasurer to convey surplus real property known as Learning Center in City of Vineland, County of Cumberland.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted by S3247
2018-12-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3247 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.14.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback