NJ A4772 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1252
Note: Carry Foward to future S655
Note: Carry Foward to future S655
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public community water systems to provide customers with certain information regarding lead in drinking water. *
Title
Requires public community water systems to provide customers with certain information regarding lead in drinking water. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4772 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4772 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3391 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4772 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3391 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee