NJ A4773 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2510
Note: Carry Foward to future S978
Note: Carry Foward to future S978
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits possession and transport of parts and products of certain animals at PANYNJ airports and port facilities.*
Title
Prohibits possession and transport of parts and products of certain animals at PANYNJ airports and port facilities.*
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3146 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S3146 (1R) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-17-6) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway) |
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4773 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4773 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3146 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4773 (2R)
A4773 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3146 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4773 (2R)