NJ A4803 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S367
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.489.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.489.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain entities to directly bill Victims of Crime Compensation Office for counseling services provided to victims of firearm and stabbing crimes.
Title
Authorizes certain entities to directly bill Victims of Crime Compensation Office for counseling services provided to victims of firearm and stabbing crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.489. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S4211 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4803 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.489.
S4211 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4803 (1R)
S4211 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4803 (1R)