NJ A4810 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2992 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2992 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for horse racing purse subsidies and that portion of sums received by the horse racing permit holder from sports wagering will be paid to horsemen's associations pursuant to agreement with racetrack; makes appropriation.*
Title
Provides for horse racing purse subsidies and that portion of sums received by the horse racing permit holder from sports wagering will be paid to horsemen's associations pursuant to agreement with racetrack; makes appropriation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted by S2992 (2R) |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2992 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Approved P.L.2019, c.36.