NJ A4814 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes transient accommodation taxes and fees only applicable if it is obtained through a marketplace or if it is a professionally managed unit.*
Title
Makes transient accommodation taxes and fees only applicable if it is obtained through a marketplace or if it is a professionally managed unit.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3158 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3158 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.235. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-1) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (32-0) (Gopal) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Gopal) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3158 (SCS/1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (46-26-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (DiMaso) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (44-28-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To As (Wirths) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3158 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4814/4520 (ACS/1R)