NJ A4833 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1084
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands crime of bias intimidation; establishes additional penalties for crimes of bias intimidation and harassment; establishes bias intimidation motivation damages.
Title
Expands crime of bias intimidation; establishes additional penalties for crimes of bias intimidation and harassment; establishes bias intimidation motivation damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-2) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4833 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3067 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3067 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee