NJ A4884 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S781 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S781 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen and requires annual report.
Title
Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen and requires annual report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S781 (4R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S781 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.216.