NJ A4903 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2189
Note: Carry Foward to future S1449
Note: Carry Foward to future S1449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Title
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3357 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3357 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading