NJ A4903 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S396 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S396 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts statute of limitations on damage claim for construction defect in common interest community.
Title
Adjusts statute of limitations on damage claim for construction defect in common interest community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S396 (1R) |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S396 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.379.
S3649 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3649 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee