NJ A4914 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3465
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3465
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for examination and license to practice mortuary science.
Title
Revises requirements for examination and license to practice mortuary science.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3465 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3465 (Same As) 2019-06-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.130.