NJ A4918 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2574
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies stadiums and arenas owned by local government entities are exempt from property taxation.
Title
Clarifies stadiums and arenas owned by local government entities are exempt from property taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3301 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S3301 (1R) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-8-4) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4918 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3301 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4918 (1R)
S3301 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4918 (1R)