NJ A4918 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.198.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.198.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Secretary of State to designate one-stop event planning contact person for certain events held in NJ.
Title
Requires Secretary of State to designate one-stop event planning contact person for certain events held in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3306 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.198. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3306 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3306 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A4918