NJ A4938 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.236.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.236.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish "My Life, My Plan" program to support women of childbearing age in developing reproductive life plan.
Title
Requires DOH to establish "My Life, My Plan" program to support women of childbearing age in developing reproductive life plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3376 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.236. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-8-1) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3376 (3R) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-12-0) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3376 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4938 (2R)