NJ A4967 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A980
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to conduct survey on status of antenatal prenatal care clinics in New Jersey.*
Title
Requires DOH to conduct survey on status of antenatal prenatal care clinics in New Jersey.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4967 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3434 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3434 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee