NJ A4972 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1925
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain consumer protections related to arbitration organizations.
Title
Establishes certain consumer protections related to arbitration organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1490 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.493. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-5-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-12) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S1490 (SCS/1R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Beach) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-5-0) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1490 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4972 (ACS/2R)
S1925 (Carry Over) 2016-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1925 (Carry Over) 2016-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee