NJ A4978 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1838
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.494.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.494.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits online education services from using and disclosing certain information, engaging in targeted advertising, and requires deletion of certain information in certain circumstances.*
Title
Prohibits online education services from using and disclosing certain information, engaging in targeted advertising, and requires deletion of certain information in certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3498 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3498 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.494. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Motion Suspend 22:4a (75-0-0) (Timberlake) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-1) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S3498 (1R) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4978 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.494.
S3498 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A4978 (3R)
S3498 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A4978 (3R)