NJ A4987 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns refunds following terminations or cancellations of guaranteed asset protection waivers.
Title
Concerns refunds following terminations or cancellations of guaranteed asset protection waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2994 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2994 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.181.