NJ A5008 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2078 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2078 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Stillbirth Resource Center" and regional Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Committee, and programs for the prevention and reduction of incidences of stillbirth; expands list of professionals authorized to provide stillbirth-related care.
Title
Establishes "Stillbirth Resource Center" and regional Fetal and Infant Mortality Review Committee, and programs for the prevention and reduction of incidences of stillbirth; expands list of professionals authorized to provide stillbirth-related care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2078 (3R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2078 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate