NJ A5023 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.495.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.495.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from DOT permitting requirements certain signs not located in protected areas that have been approved by municipality.
Title
Exempts from DOT permitting requirements certain signs not located in protected areas that have been approved by municipality.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3467 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3467 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.495. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3467 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3467 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5023 (1R)