NJ A5039 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1464
Note: Carry Foward to future S1676
Note: Carry Foward to future S1622
Note: Carry Foward to future S1676
Note: Carry Foward to future S1622
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires correctional police officers to wear body worn cameras.
Title
Requires correctional police officers to wear body worn cameras.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-4-4) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5039 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5039 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5039 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3286 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5039 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5039 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3286 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee