NJ A5043 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3661 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3661 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies assessment payment and election participation requirements in planned real estate developments.
Title
Clarifies assessment payment and election participation requirements in planned real estate developments.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3661 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3661 (Same As) 2019-08-27 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.