NJ A5066 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3330 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes pilot program in DCF to study impact of child care services provided by community providers operating in public schools facilities; requires community providers to meet certain criteria. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes pilot program in DCF to study impact of child care services provided by community providers operating in public schools facilities; requires community providers to meet certain criteria. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted by S3330 (3R)
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3330 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (25-5)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback