NJ A5072 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Defense Against Porch Pirates Act"; creates new category of theft, with penalties including mandatory restitution and community service, for taking package delivered to residence by cargo carrier.*
Title
"Defense Against Porch Pirates Act"; creates new category of theft, with penalties including mandatory restitution and community service, for taking package delivered to residence by cargo carrier.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3496 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3496 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-2) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3496 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3496 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5072 (1R)