NJ A5087 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A801
Note: Carry Foward to future S3502
Note: Carry Foward to future S3502
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require business seeking to perform State contract to disclose certain labor and employment law violations.
Title
Require business seeking to perform State contract to disclose certain labor and employment law violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5087 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5087 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3429 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5087 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3429 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee