NJ A5096 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Extends foreclosure protection and mortgage relief programs for certain Superstorm Sandy-impacted homeowners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends foreclosure protection and mortgage relief programs for certain Superstorm Sandy-impacted homeowners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3582 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.131.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S3582 (1R)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-10SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-3)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3582 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5096 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback