NJ A5162 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.191.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.191.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits county board of chosen freeholders to increase membership of county board of elections.*
Title
Permits county board of chosen freeholders to increase membership of county board of elections.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3554 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.191. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-11) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3554 (1R) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-4-3) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3554 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A5162 (1R)