NJ A5191 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1080 (SCS/5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1080 (SCS/5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns driver's license suspension for certain crimes and offenses.**
Title
Concerns driver's license suspension for certain crimes and offenses.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1080 (SCS/5R) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1080 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.276.