NJ A5210 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Trenton Capital City Aid Program; appropriates $10 million.
Title
Establishes Trenton Capital City Aid Program; appropriates $10 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3587 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3587 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.138.