NJ A5225 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2959
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1712 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1712 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires consumer notification of vehicle warranty for aftermarket and recycled parts.
Title
Requires consumer notification of vehicle warranty for aftermarket and recycled parts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S1712 (1R) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1712 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.280.
S2959 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2959 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee