NJ A5248 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A988
Note: Carry Over of previous S3180
Note: Carry Over of previous S3180
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.354.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.354.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Preserves certain requirements that health insurance plans cover essential health benefits.*
Title
Preserves certain requirements that health insurance plans cover essential health benefits.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S562 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S562 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.354. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-19-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-8) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S562 (SCS) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-23-2) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5248 (Carry Over) 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.354.
S562 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5248 (ACS/1R)
S3180 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S562 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5248 (ACS/1R)
S3180 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee